TN SB0898 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the due date, from February 1 each year to July 1 each year, of the commissioner of education's report to the governor and general assembly regarding the Schools Against Violence in Education (SAVE) Act. - Amends TCA Section 8-36-205; Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 8 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 42.
Title
As introduced, changes the due date, from February 1 each year to July 1 each year, of the commissioner of education's report to the governor and general assembly regarding the Schools Against Violence in Education (SAVE) Act. - Amends TCA Section 8-36-205; Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 8 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 42.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0678 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education