TN HB0678 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the due date, from February 1 each year to July 1 each year, of the commissioner of education's report to the governor and general assembly regarding the Schools Against Violence in Education (SAVE) Act. - Amends TCA Section 8-36-205; Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 8 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 42.
Title
As introduced, changes the due date, from February 1 each year to July 1 each year, of the commissioner of education's report to the governor and general assembly regarding the Schools Against Violence in Education (SAVE) Act. - Amends TCA Section 8-36-205; Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 8 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 42.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Ref. to Education |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0898 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee