TN SB0890 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the interest rate for scholarship loans evidenced by notes made payable to the Tennessee student assistance corporation for fellowship awards received by an aspiring teacher through the minority teaching fellows program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, relative to financial aid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1338 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration