TN SB0885 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-19 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-19 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires compliance with state and federal constitutions as well as judicial decisions in passing congressional redistricting plan. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 16, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires compliance with state and federal constitutions as well as judicial decisions in passing congressional redistricting plan. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 16, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Lowe Finney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-19 | Withdrawn. | |
2012-01-19 | Recalled from S. Jud. Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0824 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-23 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0885&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0885.pdf |