TN SB0852 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 04/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 04/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that a vacation lodging service is not a short-term rental unit marketplace for purposes of being responsible for collecting and remitting tourist accommodation taxes and hotel occupancy taxes. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 4, relative to taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Effective date(s) 04/30/2021 | |
2021-05-05 | Pub. Ch. 264 | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 80, Nays 5, PNV 3 |
2021-04-19 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0319) |
2021-04-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0152) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0918 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 264