TN HB0918 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 264
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 264
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that a vacation lodging service is not a short-term rental unit marketplace for purposes of being responsible for collecting and remitting tourist accommodation taxes and hotel occupancy taxes. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 4, relative to taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Rep. Michele Carringer [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 264 | |
2021-04-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0852 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 04/30/2021