TN SB0840 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends, from December 31 to January 15, the date by which the transportation equity fund annual report, which includes tax revenues from fuels used for aviation, railways, and water carriers, must be submitted to the governor and members of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0703 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.