TN HB0703 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends, from December 31 to January 15, the date by which the transportation equity fund annual report, which includes tax revenues from fuels used for aviation, railways, and water carriers, must be submitted to the governor and members of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-01HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-26HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0840 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback