TN SB0831 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 205
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 205
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that a criminal prosecution may be commenced by the issuance of a warrant identifying the offender by a deoxyribonucleic acid (DNA) profile; applicable to commencement of prosecution for any offense, regardless of when committed, except those offenses for which prosecution is barred on July 1, 2013, because the applicable time limitation set out has expired. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, provides that a criminal prosecution may be commenced by the issuance of a warrant identifying the offender by a deoxyribonucleic acid (DNA) profile; applicable to commencement of prosecution for any offense, regardless of when committed, except those offenses for which prosecution is barred on July 1, 2013, because the applicable time limitation set out has expired. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Rep. Ryan Haynes [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Pub. Ch. 205 |
2013-04-29 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2013 |
2013-04-23 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-04-10 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-10 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 1 |
2013-04-10 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0190) |
2013-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0201) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/1/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1037 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 205