TN SB0831 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 343
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 343
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that at least 15 days prior to removal of a tobacco product manufacturer or brand family from the tobacco product manufacturer directory, the commissioner of revenue must post notification of such removal in the directory and transmit notice to any person who provides an email address to the commissioner for the purposes of receiving notifications of directory updates via email. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 26.
Title
As enacted, requires that at least 15 days prior to removal of a tobacco product manufacturer or brand family from the tobacco product manufacturer directory, the commissioner of revenue must post notification of such removal in the directory and transmit notice to any person who provides an email address to the commissioner for the purposes of receiving notifications of directory updates via email. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 26.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-28 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 343 | |
2009-05-20 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0394) | |
2009-05-20 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-05-14 | Recalled from S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-04-28 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0530 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-17 - Pub. Ch. 343