TN SB0829 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-23 - Action def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 4/29/09
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-23 - Action def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 4/29/09
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the admission of any evidence concerning parental alienation syndrome in any proceeding involving a custody determination of a minor child. - Amends TCA Title 24, Chapter 7 and Title 36.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the admission of any evidence concerning parental alienation syndrome in any proceeding involving a custody determination of a minor child. - Amends TCA Title 24, Chapter 7 and Title 36.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Action def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 4/29/09 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0831 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-22 - Action Def. in s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA to 2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0829&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0829.pdf |