TN SB0822 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1071
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Native Species Lumber Act." - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 43, Chapter 28, Part 3 and Title 68, Chapter 120.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Native Species Lumber Act." - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 43, Chapter 28, Part 3 and Title 68, Chapter 120.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1071
2016-04-19SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2016-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016
2016-04-18SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2016
2016-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016
2016-04-14SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2016
2016-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2016
2015-03-25SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2015-03-18SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/25/2015
2015-03-18SenateAction deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/25/2015
2015-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/18/2015
2015-02-18SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2015-02-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0978 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1071

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback