TN SB0790 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, defines "system of incentives" to include regulatory flexibility recognizing increased environmental performance and enhanced water quality under specified permitted activities through permit conditions pursuant to duly promulgated rules. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7, Chapter 35; Title 65; Title 68 and Title 69.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7, Chapter 35; Title 65; Title 68 and Title 69, relative to water quality.
Sponsors
Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective date(s) 4/28/2021 | |
2021-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 263 | |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0081) |
2021-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0054) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1144 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 263