TN HB1144 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, defines "system of incentives" to include regulatory flexibility recognizing increased environmental performance and enhanced water quality under specified permitted activities through permit conditions pursuant to duly promulgated rules. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7, Chapter 35; Title 65; Title 68 and Title 69.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7, Chapter 35; Title 65; Title 68 and Title 69, relative to water quality.
Sponsors
Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 263 | |
2021-04-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0790 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2021