TN SB0790 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to the state's special education laws; transfers, from the state board of education to the department of education, control over the state's special schools. - Amends TCA Section 4-5-322; Title 49, Chapter 10 and Title 49, Chapter 50.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes to the state's special education laws; transfers, from the state board of education to the department of education, control over the state's special schools. - Amends TCA Section 4-5-322; Title 49, Chapter 10 and Title 49, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 107 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 04/11/2019 | |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0113) |
2019-04-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0034) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0029) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0070) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0934 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 107