TN HB0934 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/25/2019
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Hearing: Mar 25 @ 2:00 pm in House Hearing Room I
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes various changes to the state's special education laws; transfers, from the state board of education to the department of education, control over the state's special schools. - Amends TCA Section 4-5-322; Title 49, Chapter 10 and Title 49, Chapter 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes various changes to the state's special education laws; transfers, from the state board of education to the department of education, control over the state's special schools. - Amends TCA Section 4-5-322; Title 49, Chapter 10 and Title 49, Chapter 50.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/25/2019
2019-03-20HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseAction def. in Education to 3/13/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/6/2019
2019-02-26HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Education-- Government Operations for Review
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0790 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-14 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback