TN SB0787 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides for re-establishment of elected office of school superintendent for certain counties or cities upon two-thirds vote of governing body; any such ordinance or resolution once approved is not operative until approved in an election; provides for qualifications of candidates. - Amends TCA Section 49-2-203 and Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, provides for re-establishment of elected office of school superintendent for certain counties or cities upon two-thirds vote of governing body; any such ordinance or resolution once approved is not operative until approved in an election; provides for qualifications of candidates. - Amends TCA Section 49-2-203 and Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | Withdrawn. | |
2012-02-02 | Recalled from S. Ed Comm. | |
2011-04-20 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0902 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-12 - Failed In: Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0787&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0787.pdf |