TN SB0782 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing grants made by the department to fund reentry programs that reduce recidivism and probation revocations; redefines recidivism. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing grants made by the department to fund reentry programs that reduce recidivism and probation revocations; redefines recidivism. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 249 | |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0926 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 249