TN SB0778 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends from February 1 until March 1 the date by which a beer board must file its annual statistical report to the commission. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As introduced, extends from February 1 until March 1 the date by which a beer board must file its annual statistical report to the commission. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1386 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-22 - Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/29/2017