TN SB0775 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Pub. Ch. 413
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Pub. Ch. 413
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies procedures for determining retired law enforcement officer's eligibility to carry a firearm under federal law. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, specifies procedures for determining retired law enforcement officer's eligibility to carry a firearm under federal law. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY McNally (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY McNally (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Pub. Ch. 413 | |
2011-06-10 | Effective date(s) 06/06/11 | |
2011-06-06 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-31 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-25 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-20 | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-20 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0372) | |
2011-05-20 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-05-19 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-05-18 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-05-18 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-18 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0544) | |
2011-05-16 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to 5/10/11 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0888 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 413