TN HB0888 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 413
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 413
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies procedures for determining retired law enforcement officer's eligibility to carry a firearm under federal law. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, specifies procedures for determining retired law enforcement officer's eligibility to carry a firearm under federal law. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Curry Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 413 | |
2011-05-20 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-18 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-12 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-05-03 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0775 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-10 - Pub. Ch. 413