TN SB0761 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 04/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 04/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, sets time limits on the filing of claims by the bureau of TennCare against TennCare recipients' estates. - Amends TCA Section 30-2-310.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 30-2-310, relative to time limitations on filing claims by the bureau of TennCare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Effective date(s) 04/07/2021 | |
2021-04-12 | Pub. Ch. 102 | |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-03-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0006) |
2021-03-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0024) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/11/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0093 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 102