TN SB0753 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/29/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/29/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the chief officer of a facility to notify certain persons within a certain time after the death of a person admitted to the facility; requires the department to strive to ensure at least a majority of the members of each regional citizen-based planning and policy council are former service recipients or family members of service recipients; makes other changes relative to mental health and substance abuse services. - Amends TCA Section 33-2-203; Section 33-2-901; Section 33-4-109 and Section 63-1-155.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 33-2-203; Section 33-2-901; Section 33-4-109 and Section 63-1-155, relative to mental health and substance abuse services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Effective date(s) 03/29/2021 | |
2021-04-06 | Pub. Ch. 62 | |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-03-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-03-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0081 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 62