TN SB0748 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes an assessor of property to maintain records in electronic format.
Title
As enacted, authorizes an assessor of property to maintain records in electronic format.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 248 | |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0762 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 248