TN HB0762 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes an assessor of property to maintain records in electronic format.
Title
As enacted, authorizes an assessor of property to maintain records in electronic format.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Pub. Ch. 248 | |
2017-05-11 | Effective date(s) 05/02/2017 | |
2017-05-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0380) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0310) |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0748 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 248