TN SB0746 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes minimum attendance requirement for commission members and requires removal of members who do not meet the requirement; deletes provision giving appointing authorities discretion to remove commission members who miss more than three regularly scheduled meetings in a fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As introduced, establishes minimum attendance requirement for commission members and requires removal of members who do not meet the requirement; deletes provision giving appointing authorities discretion to remove commission members who miss more than three regularly scheduled meetings in a fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1253 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.