TN SB0743 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, restricts the use of the title "nurse" to those actively licensed or certified by the board of nursing; revises the provisions governing the board of nursing's enjoining violations of practicing nursing without a license. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8; Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 4 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, restricts the use of the title "nurse" to those actively licensed or certified by the board of nursing; revises the provisions governing the board of nursing's enjoining violations of practicing nursing without a license. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8; Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 4 and Title 63.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 245
2019-04-17SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/10/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/3/2019
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0422 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 245

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback