TN SB0734 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioners of economic and community development and revenue to conduct a joint study, to be presented to the general assembly on or before February 15, 2012, on the impact of the expiration of federal renewal community incentive programs on urban municipalities and the implementation of other economic development and tax incentive programs for urban communities. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioners of economic and community development and revenue to conduct a joint study, to be presented to the general assembly on or before February 15, 2012, on the impact of the expiration of federal renewal community incentive programs on urban municipalities and the implementation of other economic development and tax incentive programs for urban communities. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1773 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-13 - Action Def. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee to 2012
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0734&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0734.pdf |