TN SB0731 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the sex offender treatment board to compile a list of approved sex offender evaluation providers and sex offender treatment providers who are authorized to provide required sex offender evaluations and treatment. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 7, relative to sex offender evaluation and treatment.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/22/2021 | |
2021-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 204 | |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0066 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 204