TN HB0066 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021
Pending: House Criminal Justice Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Mar 10 @ 9:00 am in House Hearing Room II
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the sex offender treatment board to compile a list of approved sex offender evaluation providers and sex offender treatment providers who are authorized to provide required sex offender evaluations and treatment. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 7, relative to sex offender evaluation and treatment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021
2021-03-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/10/2021
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2021
2021-02-24HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/3/2021
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
2021-02-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2021
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0731 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback