TN SB0728 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department to identify locations of state and local government roads in this state where injuries to bicyclists and pedestrians are elevated in comparison to the statewide average. - Amends TCA Title 54 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 54 and Title 55, relative to highway safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 385 | |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/21/2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4-19-23 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0685 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-19 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023