TN SB0720 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the Tennessee middle college scholarship, funded by net lottery proceeds. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, creates the Tennessee middle college scholarship, funded by net lottery proceeds. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 405 | |
2017-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/18/2017 | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2017-05-09 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0630) |
2017-05-09 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0629) |
2017-05-09 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0262) |
2017-05-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-05-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0512) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0174) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0980 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 405