TN SB0718 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Extended Juvenile Jurisdiction Act," which establishes a juvenile justice pilot program in Shelby County. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to the Extended Juvenile Jurisdiction Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0696 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee