TN HB0696 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Extended Juvenile Jurisdiction Act," which establishes a juvenile justice pilot program in Shelby County. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to the Extended Juvenile Jurisdiction Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0718 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee