TN SB0717 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, negates mandatory application of certain laws on local governments that are not fully funded; prohibits an agency of state government from creating a new fee that will impact local governments in any year in which the general state revenues to the agency have decreased from the previous year. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5, Part 2 and Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 53.
Title
As introduced, negates mandatory application of certain laws on local governments that are not fully funded; prohibits an agency of state government from creating a new fee that will impact local governments in any year in which the general state revenues to the agency have decreased from the previous year. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5, Part 2 and Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 53.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0886 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0717&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/SB0717.pdf |