TN SB0706 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the Tennessee financial literacy commission to create an incentive payment program that provides incentive payments to middle school and senior high school teachers that promotes financial literacy to students in middle schools and senior high schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 17, relative to financial literacy incentives.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-15SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2023-03-10SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2023
2023-03-01SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/15/2023
2023-02-22SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/1/2023
2023-02-22SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/1/2023
2023-02-15SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/22/2023
2023-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2023-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-26SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1428 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback