TN SB0688 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines "breakfast" for specific service-sign purposes. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Title
As introduced, defines "breakfast" for specific service-sign purposes. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. Cal 6-10-20 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to last calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0747 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020