TN HB0747 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines "breakfast" for specific service-sign purposes. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Title
As introduced, defines "breakfast" for specific service-sign purposes. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2019-03-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0688 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee