TN SB0684 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows certain persons deprived of the right of suffrage to apply for a voter registration card and have the right of suffrage provisionally restored if the person enters into a payment plan to become current on all child support obligations. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 29, relative to voting rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0896 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee