TN SB0672 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Family Insurance Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21; Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 21; Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 50, relative to insurance benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2022 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1295 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.