TN HB1295 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022
Pending: House Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Family Insurance Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21; Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 21; Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 50, relative to insurance benefits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 4/7/2021
2021-03-31HouseAction Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 4/7/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2021-02-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0672 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2022

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback