TN SB0655 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds, as a condition to a court permitting a dependent or neglected child under three years of age to remain with the child's parent, guardian, or other custodian, a requirement that the parent, guardian, or other custodian submit to the department of children's services documentation of a well-baby routine examination by a licensed physician at certain intervals if the child has been diagnosed with neonatal abstinence syndrome. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 39; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to neonatal abstinence syndrome.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023
2023-03-28SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2023-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023
2023-03-22SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023
2023-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023
2023-03-21SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023
2023-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-26SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0914 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback