TN HB0914 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds, as a condition to a court permitting a dependent or neglected child under three years of age to remain with the child's parent, guardian, or other custodian, a requirement that the parent, guardian, or other custodian submit to the department of children's services documentation of a well-baby routine examination by a licensed physician at certain intervals if the child has been diagnosed with neonatal abstinence syndrome. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 39; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to neonatal abstinence syndrome.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-17HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2024-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024
2024-03-20HouseDef. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2024-03-20HousePlaced behind the budget
2024-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2024
2023-04-18HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-04-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023
2023-04-05HousePlaced behind the budget
2023-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2023
2023-03-29HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2023-03-29HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/29/2023
2023-03-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/21/2023
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/14/2023
2023-02-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/14/2023
2023-02-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/28/2023
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2023-02-01HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2023-02-01HouseSponsor change.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0655 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback