TN SB0648 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a cap on the price that a health insurance carrier can charge for insulin. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 53; Title 56, Chapter 7; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 53; Title 56, Chapter 7; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, Chapter 5, relative to insulin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1595 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.