TN SB0645 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from 30 days to 45 days, the time a child care program or entity has from the date of the mailing of a notice of failure to file an annual report to submit the report to the commissioner of education or have its certificate of approval suspended. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1394 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.