TN SB0643 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the department to publish the guidelines for the best practices for identifying and reporting signs of child abuse, child sexual abuse, and human trafficking in which the victim is a child on the department's website. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71, relative to victims of human trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 408
2021-04-26SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/26/2021
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-04-14SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
2021-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0723 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 408

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback