TN HB0723 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the department to publish the guidelines for the best practices for identifying and reporting signs of child abuse, child sexual abuse, and human trafficking in which the victim is a child on the department's website. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71, relative to victims of human trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Pub. Ch. 408
2021-05-18 Effective date(s) 05/12/2021
2021-05-12 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-04HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-05-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-28HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-04-26SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-04-26SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-15SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-14HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-14HousePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-04-08HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021
2021-03-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/17/2021
2021-03-10HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2021
2021-03-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/10/2021
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/3/2021
2021-02-20HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
2021-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-02-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0643 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 408

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback