TN SB0633 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Pub. Ch. 408
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Pub. Ch. 408
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that when a defendant commits a homicide or assault against a pregnant woman, the woman's fetus, regardless of viability, is also considered a victim of the offense. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-107 and Section 39-13-214.
Title
As enacted, specifies that when a defendant commits a homicide or assault against a pregnant woman, the woman's fetus, regardless of viability, is also considered a victim of the offense. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-107 and Section 39-13-214.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Pub. Ch. 408 | |
2011-06-10 | Effective date(s) 07/01/11 | |
2011-06-06 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-31 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-25 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-21 | Passed H., Ayes 80, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-21 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-05-21 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-05-21 | Passed S., Ayes 26, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/21/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-22 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-14 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0498 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 408