TN HB0498 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 408
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 408
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that when a defendant commits a homicide or assault against a pregnant woman, the woman's fetus, regardless of viability, is also considered a victim of the offense. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-107 and Section 39-13-214.
Title
As enacted, specifies that when a defendant commits a homicide or assault against a pregnant woman, the woman's fetus, regardless of viability, is also considered a victim of the offense. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-107 and Section 39-13-214.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GENERAL SUB OF JUDICIARY: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GENERAL SUB OF JUDICIARY: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 408 | |
2011-05-21 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-20 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-03-01 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/1/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on s/c cal General Sub of Judiciary for 2/23/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0633 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-10 - Pub. Ch. 408