TN SB0615 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from January 15 to February 15 of each year the date by which the department must evaluate the success of programs for at risk adolescents and report findings and recommendations to the judiciary committee of the senate and the civil justice committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 37 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 33; Title 37 and Title 49, relative to programs for at risk juveniles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1105 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.